Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Chaput, Cheryl A, Operating Engineers Pension Plan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Thorsteinson, Brett T, against Chaput, Devon M, represented by Dolnick, Keith E, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with PALAFOX, JULIE A. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 29, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions351 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time732 days |
WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 10/30/2009 12:09:00 # Pages:2
Date: October 30, 2009ORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATION 05/29/2009 15:38:00 # Pages:8
Date: May 29, 2009RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 01/07/2008 15:59:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-01-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 01/07/2008 16:01:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-01-07T00:00:00APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (CONVERSION) 10/14/2008 15:23:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 06/11/2008 12:04:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-06-11T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 10/14/2008 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 06/10/2008 16:05:00 GENERATED BY 90 DAY CONF NOTICE # Pages:1
Date: 2008-06-10T00:00:00JUDGMENT 10/14/2008 13:48:00 # Pages:18
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/29/2007 16:26:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00NOTICE - APPEARANCE & RESPONSE EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 02/10/2009 13:48:00 # Pages:2
Date: February 10, 2009DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/10/2008 11:07:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-09-10T00:00:00NOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 11/25/2008 14:58:00 # Pages:3
Date: November 25, 2008MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 07/02/2008 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-07-02T00:00:00DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/14/2008 15:23:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/01/2008 14:18:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-08-01T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/29/2007 16:25:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00PLEADING JOINDER - EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 11/25/2008 15:15:00 # Pages:2
Date: November 25, 2008SUMMONS 10/29/2007 16:26:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00OTHER 07/01/2008 14:06:00 STATUS CONF STATEMENT # Pages:1
Date: 2008-07-01T00:00:00NOTICE - TRIAL SETTING AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 07/07/2008 16:42:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-07-07T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/17/2008 14:43:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-09-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 11/01/2007 12:24:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-11-01T00:00:00NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/20/2008 15:18:00 # Pages:1
Date: October 20, 2008WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 09/11/2009 11:09:00 # Pages:2
Date: September 11, 2009REQUEST - JOINDER EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN & ORDER 11/25/2008 15:14:00 # Pages:1
Date: November 25, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE 06/05/2009 14:15:00 # Pages:1
Date: June 05, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.