Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mercado, Georgina S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mercado Jr., Alfredo L, represented by Lim, Abraham L, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with SILBAR, CLAUDIA J. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 29, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions784 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1066 days |
NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/29/2007 16:31:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00MEDIATION - STATUS 12/14/2007 16:36:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-14T00:00:00DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 12/21/2009 10:38:00 # Pages:2
Date: December 21, 2009STIPULATION - JUDGMENT MODIFICATION 09/29/2010 15:37:00 # Pages:6
Date: September 29, 2010RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 01/14/2008 15:46:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-01-14T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 12/21/2009 10:37:00 # Pages:2
Date: December 21, 2009APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (CONVERSION) 12/21/2009 10:38:00 # Pages:1
Date: December 21, 2009DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/21/2009 10:38:00 # Pages:1
Date: December 21, 2009OSC - OTHER 10/29/2007 11:05:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 12/17/2007 16:36:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-12-17T00:00:00STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 02/04/2008 11:23:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-02-04T00:00:00NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 12/21/2009 10:38:00 # Pages:1
Date: December 21, 2009SUMMONS 10/29/2007 16:31:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/29/2007 11:06:00 # Pages:4
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/15/2007 09:34:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-11-15T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/29/2007 16:30:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00ORDER - ATTEND PARENT EDUCATION / MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 10/29/2007 11:07:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 05/05/2008 09:00:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 05, 2008DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 10/29/2007 16:31:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 12/17/2007 09:00:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-12-17T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 02/04/2008 09:00:00 S/B SHOULD BE MN101 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-02-04T00:00:00STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 05/05/2008 11:03:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-05-05T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 01/14/2008 15:49:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-01-14T00:00:00JUDGMENT 12/21/2009 10:37:00 # Pages:9
Date: December 21, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.