Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Do, Tung Quoc, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Phan, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 29, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions185 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time185 days |
NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/01/2008 12:06:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 01, 2008PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/29/2007 15:55:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/01/2008 12:08:00 # Pages:2
Date: May 01, 2008SUMMONS 10/29/2007 15:55:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/29/2007 15:56:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (CONVERSION) 05/01/2008 12:07:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 01, 2008RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 10/31/2007 15:54:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-10-31T00:00:00WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/01/2008 12:07:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 01, 2008JUDGMENT 05/01/2008 12:06:00 # Pages:2
Date: May 01, 2008INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/21/2008 08:43:00 # Pages:4
Date: February 21, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.