We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
|
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
|
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections
|
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
|
|
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
286 days
|
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
|
|
|
Case Events for
Unifund Ccr Vs Perez
Date |
Type |
Description |
|
July 29, 2008 |
Docket Event |
COURT ORDERED ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE .
|
|
July 29, 2008 |
Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL
|
|
July 29, 2008 |
Docket Event |
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 07/29/2008 09:00:00 AM.
|
|
May 30, 2008 |
Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL RESCHEDULED FOR 07/29/2008 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
|
|
May 30, 2008 |
Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/29/2008 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
|
|
May 29, 2008 |
Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL CONTINUED TO 07/29/2008 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.
|
|
May 29, 2008 |
Docket Event |
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 05/27/2008 09:00:00 AM.
|
|
April 03, 2008 |
Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL RESCHEDULED FOR 05/27/2008 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
|
|
April 03, 2008 |
Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/27/2008 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
|
|
April 02, 2008 |
Docket Event |
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 04/01/2008 08:30:00 AM.
|
|
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.