Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ford Motor Credit Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Jimi Lee, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2007 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1248 days |
WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/10/2011
Date: February 10, 2011ORDER - OTHER (COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/22/2008
Date: 2008-01-22T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/22/2008
Date: 2008-01-22T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 02/25/2011
Date: February 25, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.