Ford Motor Credit Company,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Stephen D Conduff,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Ford Motor Credit Company v. Stephen D Conduff
Case Events for
Ford Motor Credit Company v. Stephen D Conduff
Date
Type
Description
April 13, 2010
Docket Event
WRIT UPDATED ON 07/16/2009.
January 15, 2010
Docket Event
WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/15/2010
July 16, 2009
Docket Event
WRIT ISSUED.
July 16, 2009
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10425345 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10249219.
June 30, 2009
Docket Event
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 06/30/2009
April 01, 2008
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/01/2008 AT 08:30:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER
March 13, 2008
Docket Event
ABSTRACT ISSUED.
March 13, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10072614 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 96999.
January 22, 2008
Docket Event
CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.
January 22, 2008
Docket Event
ORDER - OTHER FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/22/2008