Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Alejanddra Mora, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2007 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions350 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time350 days |
NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT
Date: May 02, 2008NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT
Date: September 24, 2008REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 03/27/2008
Date: March 27, 2008NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 04/03/2008
Date: April 03, 2008REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 10/01/2008
Date: October 01, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.