Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2007 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions159 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/03/2008
Date: 2008-01-03T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/24/2008
Date: 2008-03-24T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING (USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 03/24/2008
Date: 2008-03-24T00:00:00WRIT (LOS ANGELES) ISSUED ON 11/20/2019
Date: November 20, 2019APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 09/22/2017
Date: September 22, 2017WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 10/29/2008
Date: 2008-10-29T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/22/2008
Date: 2008-01-22T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY ON 01/22/2008
Date: 2008-01-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 09/22/2017) RECEIVED ON 09/22/2017.
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.