Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aniag, Emelita C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nguyen, Tung T, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 04, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time161 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment filmed returned-FL Family Law Judgment Date:10/16/07 Microfilm date 02/20/08 Roll 381 |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt FLCE99603. |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Req or stip and order w/o hrg Request or stipulation and order not requiring a hearing, cash lml 01/04/08 |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Sent Stipulated Qualified Domestic Relations Order along with $20.00 cash in envelope to Clerks for processing. 12-31-07 ddk |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Sent Stipulated Qualified Domestic Relations Order along with $20.00 cash in envelope to Family Law Examiners. rkb 12/28/07 |
|
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Archives to Microfilm the Judgment. Copies to Attorney's BOX 26. 10/16/07. MR. | |
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg Marital Status Ends: 10/16/07. 10/16/07. MR. |
|
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. 10/16/07. MR. | |
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Dissolution _x__ Legal Separation ___ 10/16/07. MR. Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso |
|
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Back to FLEX. 9/28/07. MR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.