We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wanda G Raby-Owens ,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
against
Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with Frederick P. Horn presiding.
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Category
Uninsured Motorist
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
1065 days
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Case Cycle Time
1065 days
Defendants
Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Case Events for
Wanda G Raby-Owens v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Date
Type
Description
September 16, 2010
Docket Event
PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
September 16, 2010
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
September 16, 2010
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RABY-OWENS, WANDA G ON 09/16/2010
Get Document
September 07, 2010
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2010 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Frederick P. Horn
Get Document
December 08, 2007
Docket Event
MINUTES GENERATED (MOTION - GRANTED/DENIED) ON 11/27/2007
November 28, 2007
Docket Event
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY HEARD ON 11/27/2007 AT 13:30:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER
November 28, 2007
Docket Event
NOTICE OF RULING (NOTICE OF RULING) WAS FILED BY PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/28/2007
November 28, 2007
Docket Event
PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD HEARD ON 11/27/2007 AT 13:30:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER
November 27, 2007
Docket Event
STIPULATION TO JUDGE PRO TEM (STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY JUDGE) WAS FILED BY WANDA G RABY-OWENS ON 11/27/2007
November 21, 2007
Docket Event
NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED BY WANDA G RABY-OWENS ON 11/21/2007
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.