Case Events for
Laguna Niguel Investors Vs Mark L Pickens
Date
Type
Description
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
JUDGMENT FILED BY LAGUNA NIGUEL INVESTORS NO 1 LLC ON 09/30/2008
September 22, 2008
Docket Event
REJECTED ONE WRIT OF POSSESSION, UNLAWFUL DETAINER: NO ORDER OR JUDGMENT ON FILE PERMITTING ISSUANCE OF WRIT
September 17, 2008
Docket Event
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/05/2008 09:00:00 AM.
September 05, 2008
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED
September 05, 2008
Docket Event
ORDER - OTHER (EX PARTE APPL.) FILED BY LAGUNA NIGUEL INVESTORS NO 1 LLC ON 09/05/2008
September 05, 2008
Docket Event
EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/2008 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
September 05, 2008
Docket Event
CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT.
September 04, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10193786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10017652.
September 04, 2008
Docket Event
EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) FILED BY LAGUNA NIGUEL INVESTORS NO 1 LLC ON 09/04/2008