We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Easter Seals Southern California ,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
against
Brea, City Of ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Category
Breach Of Contract/Warranty
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
119 days
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Plaintiffs
Easter Seals Southern California
Case Events for
Easter Seals Southern California v. Brea, City Of
Date
Type
Description
February 13, 2008
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
February 13, 2008
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY EASTER SEALS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 02/13/2008
Get Document
December 20, 2007
Docket Event
EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE) FILED BY EASTER SEALS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 12/20/2007
December 20, 2007
Docket Event
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
December 12, 2007
Docket Event
EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS FILED BY EASTER SEALS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 12/12/2007
December 12, 2007
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10015633 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 40045.
December 05, 2007
Docket Event
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/2008 AT 08:30:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER
December 05, 2007
Docket Event
NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 12/05/2007
October 17, 2007
Docket Event
COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY EASTER SEALS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ON 10/17/2007
October 17, 2007
Docket Event
CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/17/2007
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.