We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Granite State Insurance Company ,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
against
Com Services, Inc ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Category
Breach Of Contract/Warranty
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
77 days
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Plaintiffs
Granite State Insurance Company
Case Events for
Granite State Insurance Company v. Com Services, Inc
Date
Type
Description
January 02, 2008
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/02/2008
Get Document
January 02, 2008
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
November 15, 2007
Docket Event
NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 11/15/2007
November 14, 2007
Docket Event
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/2008 AT 08:45:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER
October 17, 2007
Docket Event
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/17/2007
October 17, 2007
Docket Event
COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/17/2007
October 17, 2007
Docket Event
CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/17/2007
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.