Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
EVENT DATE: 4/9/2009 No appearance is required under the following conditions: The case is reclassified to Class III. This case is referred to Master Calendar for selection of Trial and Mandatory Sett...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
January 13, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
NOTICE: To request oral argument on this matter, you must call the Court at (916) 874-8240 (Department 45) by 4:00 p.m., the court day before this hearing and advise opposing counsel. IF AN APPEARANCE...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
September 30, 2008 | Tentative Ruling |
NOTICE: To request oral argument on this matter, you must call the Court at (916) 874-8240 (Department 45) by 4:00 p.m., the court day before this hearing and advise opposing counsel. If no call is ma...
Judge: Judy Holzer Hersher |
|
July 29, 2008 | Tentative Ruling |
NOTICE: To request oral argument on this matter, you must call the Court at (916) 874-8240 (Department 45) by 4:00 p.m., the court day before this hearing and advise opposing counsel. If no call is ma...
Judge: Judy Holzer Hersher |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.