Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2010 | Tentative Ruling |
Yasui v. Comcast Corporation – Case No. 07AS04226 - Plaintiffs' Motion for New Trial and/or Additur – Tentative Ruling The Court rules as follows on plaintiff Ronald Yasui's motion for new trial. A mo...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
May 17, 2010 | Tentative Ruling |
Case No. 07AS04226 Yasui, etc. v. Comcast, etc. This matter is set for post trial hearing on the issue of the proper amount of damages for medical specials. Following the trial of this matter the Four...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
March 26, 2010 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine 1. Motion to preclude defendants from raising prejudicial subjects during voir dire The motion is granted. It is not opposed. 2. Motion to preclude evidence regarding sel...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
April 07, 2008 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: This matter is ordered to Arbitration as of 04/10/2008.Parties must stipulate and phone in the names of at least 4 arbitrators by calling the ...
Judge: Roland L. Candee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.