Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2011 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: All remaining Cross-Complaint(s) are dismissed. The Court orders the entire action dismissed without prejudice. This dismissal is ordered purs...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
September 09, 2010 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program continued to 01/20/2011 at 08:30 in this department. An Attorney Compliance Statem...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
May 12, 2010 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program continued to 09/16/2010 at 08:30 in this department. An Attorney Compliance Statem...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
December 08, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program continued to 06/17/2010 at 08:30 in this department. New Case Management Statements shall...
Judge: Roland L. Candee |
|
June 10, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
DATE OF HEARING: 6/18/2009 No appearance is required under the following conditions: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program continued to 12/17/2009 at 08:30 AM in this department. New Ca...
Judge: Roland L. Candee |
|
December 10, 2008 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program continued to 06/18/2009 at 08:30 AM in this department. New Case Management Statements sh...
Judge: Roland L. Candee |
|
June 18, 2008 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program continued to 12/18/2008 at 08:30 AM in this department. New Case Management Statements sh...
Judge: Roland L. Candee |
|
December 24, 2007 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program continued to 06/26/2008 at 08:30 AM in this department. New Case Management Statements sh...
Judge: Michael W. Sweet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.