Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil - Limited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2011 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program continued to 09/15/2011 at 08:30 in this department. An Attorney Compliance Statem...
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
March 15, 2011 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program continued to 06/16/2011 at 08:30 in this department. An Attorney Compliance Statem...
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
January 26, 2011 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program continued to 03/17/2011 at 08:30 in this department. Absent a showing of good cau...
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
April 22, 2010 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program continued to 01/27/2011 at 08:30 in this department. An Attorney Compliance State...
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
February 05, 2010 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program continued to 04/29/2010 at 08:30 in this department. An Attorney Compliance State...
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
October 14, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
Event Date: 10/22/2009 No appearance is required under the following conditions: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program continued to 02/11/2010 at 08:30 AM in this department. An...
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
July 10, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
Event Date: 07/16/2009 No appearance is required under the following conditions: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program continued to 10/22/2009 at 08:30 AM in this department. An...
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
April 14, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
Event Date: 04/16/2009 No appearance is required under the following conditions: The Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program is scheduled for 07/16/2009 at 08:30 AM in Department ...
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
January 07, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program continued to 04/16/2009 at 08:30 AM in this department. New Case Management Statements sh...
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
September 16, 2008 | Tentative Ruling |
No appearance is required under the following conditions: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program continued to 01/08/2009 at 08:30 AM in this department. New Case Management Statements sh...
Judge: David W. Abbott |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.