Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Investment Retrievers Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Wood, Lajuan E, against Bunch, Tracy J, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SWIFT, HUGH K presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions50 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1388 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - FULLY SATISFIED LAJUAN E WOOD (Attorney) on behalf of INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC (PLAINTIFF) | |
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSED FOR ___________ COUNTY RETURNED AND FILED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR AMADOR COUNTY RETURNED AND FILED |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ___________ COUNTY WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED LAJUAN E WOOD (Attorney) on behalf of INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 71876 Date: 04/22/2008 |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST LAJUAN E WOOD (Attorney) on behalf of INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC (PLAINTIFF) | |
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT LAJUAN E WOOD (Attorney) on behalf of INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC (PLAINTIFF) | |
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Receipt: 71660 Date: 04/17/2008 | |
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY LAJUAN E WOOD REJECTING FILING OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS COURTS ADDRESS IS INCORRECT ON DOCUMENT & JUDGMENT FILED 02/19/08 | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC (PLAINTIFF); | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF LAJUAN E WOOD WAIVING EXCESS ATTORNEY'S FEES PRAYED FOR IN THE COMPLAINT INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC (PLAINTIFF); | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT TRACY J BUNCH ENTERED AS REQUESTED INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC (PLAINTIFF); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.