Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dutra, Dacia M. Brasil, Dutra, Manuel Fernando, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Bissig, Louis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2006 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time5067 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Order for Final Distribution | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Probate - Subsequent Petition re:
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Trust or Estate | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for Subsequent Accounting ($435.00) | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisal | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Reporter Fee $30 | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Letters |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.