Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Jerry F. DeMelo, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2006 |
CategoryStmt Reg Of Calif Support Order-Filed By Private Party |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order or Judgment
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Modification: Child Support and Health Care
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion (Governmental) | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support (Governmental) | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice Registration CA Sup Ord
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Stmt Registration CA Sup Order
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.