Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions452 days |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record | |
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
|
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order for Support | |
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice/Acknowledgment of Rcpt
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
|
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney-Civil (Without Court Order) | |
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Pleading on Joinder-Employees Benefit Plan | |
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Joinder of Employee Benefit Plan Order | |
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons (Joinder) - Issued & Filed | |
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.