Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Unifund Ccr Partners Assignee Of B1 Brand Extraordinary Rwrds-V., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Leach, Frederick L., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Julienne L. Rynda presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2006 |
CategoryZ - Contract Collections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions192 days |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3342 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Received | |
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment | |
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution - Returned | |
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs after Judgment, | |
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution-Issued ($40) | |
October 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment $25.00
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
|
October 30, 2006 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution-Issued ($40) | |
October 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
|
August 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Judgment (Civil) | |
August 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Request for Court Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.