Case Last Refreshed: 19 hours ago
National Credit Acceptance Inc A California Corporation, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Scalia Joseph W., against Narvaez Jaime Aka Macias Jaime N Aka Naovac Jaime Aka Navarez Jaime Aka Narvaez James Aka Macias Jamie N, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Ana Maria Luna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna Maria Luna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2006 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: (NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JAIME NARVAEZ (Defendant) | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: (NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JAIME NARVAEZ (Defendant) | |
October 16, 2017 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion - Other to correct error in rejecting renewal of judgment scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to correct error in rejecting renew...) | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing on Motion - Other to correct error in rejecting renewal of judgment scheduled for 10/16/2017 in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 updated: Result Date to 10/16/2017; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to correct error in rejecting renew...) | |
October 16, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Assignee Sacor Financial, Inc.’s motion to correct error in rejection of renewal of judgment is DENIED. Background The instant complaint was filed June 09, 2006, and was submitted for arbitration. On ...
Judge: Elaine Lu or Georgina Torres Rizk |
|
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JOSEPH W. SCALIA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CORRECT ERROR IN REJECTING RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CORRECT ERROR IN REJECTING RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SACOR FINANCIAL, INC. (ASSIGNEE) . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.