Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carney, Susan, Carney, Timothy J., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Vantassell Fornasero Et Al, against California Wine Transport, Inc., Cornick, Patrick Howard, Wine Country Transportation, Llc, Kenyon Plasetering Inc, represented by Law Office Of Katchis Harris Etc, Vantassell Fornasero Et Al, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2006 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Dismissal entered 4/21/08
Date: April 21, 2008Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: April 30, 2008Correspondence (Letter-Request to move MSC) filed.
Date: February 08, 2008Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: February 29, 2008Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: April 15, 2008Correspondence (Post Office Return of Notice) filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.