Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bautista, Nilo, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Frank G. Piazza. Jr, against Current Controls Inc, Dupont Canada, Inc, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours And Company, Harelson Mechanical, Inc, Roes 1-25, (total of 5) See All represented by Glynn & Finley, Kenneth D Harris, Scott P Brust, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: June 18, 2008Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-01-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (James S Sweet in support of MSJ) filed.
Date: 2008-03-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2008-02-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2008-02-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-03-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: June 13, 2008Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2008-03-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: May 27, 2008Statement of Undisputed Facts filed.
Date: 2008-03-07T00:00:00ORDER DETEMINING DISPOSTION OF EX PARTE
Date: 2008-02-01T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2008-01-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Jonathan A Eldredge in support of MSJ) filed.
Date: 2008-03-07T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter-GRANTED Request to Vacate MSC) filed.
Date: 2008-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: June 13, 2008Dismissal entered as requested
Date: 2008-05-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2008-05-22T00:00:00Dismissal not entered as requested. Complaint previously dismissed on 5/22/2008.
Date: June 13, 2008Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: May 23, 2008Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2008-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2007-12-07T00:00:00Request - Other (Stipulation to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed.
Date: 2008-01-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 02/13/2008 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2008-02-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Motion to Continue) filed.
Date: 2008-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial filed.
Date: 2008-02-01T00:00:00Stipulation And Order To Set Aside Default
Date: 2008-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2008-02-07T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2008-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2008-03-07T00:00:00Default denied as to Current Controls Inc on Cross-Complaint .
Date: 2008-05-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2007-12-07T00:00:00Returned Document Form - Request for Entry of Default
Date: 2008-05-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2008-01-09T00:00:00Default denied as to Dupont Canada, Inc on Legacy Case Participant Sheet (Conversion Only) .
Date: 2008-05-12T00:00:00Correspondence (From J Eldredge) filed.
Date: May 28, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.