Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Skaden, Gary, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bruce G. Fagel, against Catholic Healthcare West, Mercy San Juan Hospital, Meyers, Michael, Pathak, Ranganath, Sacramento Colon & Rectal Surgery Medical Group Inc, (total of 7) See All represented by Brian Turner, John C Hentschel, Leo H Schuering, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: December 19, 2007Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 19, 2008Ret Doc-Notice of Entry of Dismissal
Date: December 13, 2007Dismissal entered as requested
Date: March 01, 2008Dismissal entered as requested.
Date: December 07, 2007Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: November 13, 2007Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: December 07, 2007For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.