Case Events for
Lvnv Funding. Llc Vs. Jaqueline Hilbert
Date
Type
Description
July 08, 2008
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
July 08, 2008
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .
July 08, 2008
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed .
July 08, 2008
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/10/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
July 08, 2008
Docket Event
Legacy Case Participant Sheet (Conversion Only) disposed with disposition of Dismissed .
July 08, 2008
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed .
July 08, 2008
Tentative Ruling
No appearance is required under the following conditions: The Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program is scheduled for 09/04/2008 at 08:30 AM in Department 44. This case is 565 da...
Judge: Robert C. Hight
July 03, 2008
Docket Event
Case Notes generated .
June 27, 2008
Docket Event
Case Management Statement filed.
April 28, 2008
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/10/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .