Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Resurgence Financial Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nathan A Searles, against Leavitt, Yvonne, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2010-10-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2008-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: December 01, 2016Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: July 10, 2014Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: December 01, 2016Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2008-07-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2010-11-02T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: 2008-10-03T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: June 29, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2009-01-22T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: January 09, 2018Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Renewal of Judgment (Returned) filed.
Date: May 11, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.