Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Professional Recovery Systems, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Duane S Oliveira, against Martinez, Esteban Don, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2006 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 10, 2016Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2008-01-28T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 10, 2016Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2008-05-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution filed.
Date: 2008-01-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: 2008-05-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: February 05, 2010Writ of Execution Issued
Date: August 27, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied (Sacramento) filed.
Date: November 29, 2010Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2006-12-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: May 10, 2016Notice of Renewal of Judgment (Returned) filed.
Date: May 31, 2016Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: May 31, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.