Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Robert J Colclough, Iii, Rory W Clark, against Tran, Tommy, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Application for Renewal of Judgment submitted by Galaxy Portfolios LLC rejected on 06/20/2016 .
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: July 12, 2016Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: February 19, 2019Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: 2006-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed.
Date: January 07, 2019Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: September 06, 2018Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: August 22, 2016Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: August 02, 2017Notice of Renewal of Judgment (Returned) filed.
Date: August 22, 2016Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: December 20, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.