Gonzalez, Luis Alberto Contreras,
filed a(n)
Civil - Limited
case
represented by
Luis Alberto Contreras Gonzalez,
against
Sotelo, Luis Ernesto Contreras,
represented by
Urlic N Duverney,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Gonzalez, Luis Alberto Contreras v. Sotelo, Luis Ernesto Contreras
Case Events for
Gonzalez, Luis Alberto Contreras v. Sotelo, Luis Ernesto Contreras
Date
Type
Description
May 01, 2008
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program Heard
May 01, 2008
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program heard on 05/01/2008 08:30:00 AM .
April 28, 2008
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program set on 05/01/2008 08:30:00 AM published .
April 25, 2008
Docket Event
Case Notes generated .
April 24, 2008
Tentative Ruling
Nature of Proceeding: Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions The previously imposed sanctions of $150.00 imposed against Luis Alberto Contreras Gonzalez on 4/19/2007 are not paid and must be paid immediate...
Judge: David W. Abbott
April 11, 2008
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause, Minute Order (to Luis Albert Contreras Gonzalez ret'd mail)
April 04, 2008
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Sanction Notice
April 04, 2008
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/01/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause-Sanctions has been generated .
April 04, 2008
Docket Event
Gonzalez, Luis Alberto Contreras added as a Plaintiff effective 05/24/2006 .
April 04, 2008
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/24/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause-Sanctions has been generated .