Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Casey M Jensen filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Gahler, Brenda, Ramirez, Ramiro, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2006 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: December 05, 2016Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: October 01, 2012Notice - Other (of assignment of judgment and notice of new attorney of record) filed.
Date: 2012-10-01T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: December 05, 2016Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: December 27, 2016Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: March 22, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.