Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Northern California Collection Service Inc Of Sacramento, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Steven D Cribb, against Barry, James J., Hulst, Adrienne G., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Eugene L. Balonon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2006 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: January 20, 2011Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: 2008-09-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2008-05-23T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: February 04, 2011Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 10/29/2008 08:15:00 AM .
Date: 2008-10-29T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Issued)
Date: 2008-05-23T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: April 20, 2009Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2008-12-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 12/10/2008 08:15:00 AM .
Date: 2008-12-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 01/05/2009 08:15:00 AM .
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Issued) Issued
Date: September 02, 2009Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: January 24, 2012Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied (Sacramento) filed.
Date: November 24, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.