Morris, Deborah,
Moris, John,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
John J Moreno,
against
Gutierrez, Alonzo,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Morris, Deborah v. Gutierrez, Alonzo
, et al.
Case Events for
Morris, Deborah v. Gutierrez, Alonzo
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
December 28, 2007
Docket Event
Legacy Case Participant Sheet (Conversion Only) disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
December 28, 2007
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
December 28, 2007
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/17/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
December 28, 2007
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
December 27, 2007
Docket Event
Dismissal entered as requested.
December 27, 2007
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
November 06, 2007
Docket Event
CMP Packet
November 01, 2007
Hearing
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard
September 25, 2007
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department 39 .
September 25, 2007
Docket Event
Morris, Deborah added as a Plaintiff effective 09/25/2007 .