Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Harvest Credit Management Vii Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Jowers, James, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2015-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed.
Date: June 12, 2017Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: June 12, 2017Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: January 08, 2016Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: July 24, 2017Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: October 13, 2017Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: February 19, 2019Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 11, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.