Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flaharty Catherine, Flaharty Brett, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Churchwell Jason, Churchwell Meirav Benzoin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Floyd V. Baxter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/09/15 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM. |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE. |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event | * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013 | |
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event | * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE VAN NUYS COURTHOUSE | |
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event | * CASE RENUMBERED FROM NEW05S00727 TO LAV05SK0727 | |
September 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
August 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. FLOYD V. BAXTER, JUDGE WITH S. SCHROEDER, CLERK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BRETT FLAHARTY, CATHERINE FLAHARTY . DEFENDANT APPEARING MEIRAV VENZOIN CHURCHWELL, JASON CHURCHWELL . |
|
August 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/19/05 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM. |
|
August 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
(FLAHARTY, BRETT) REFUSES TO STIPULATE TO THE JUDGE PRO TEMPORE, CAUSE TRANSFERRED TO DIV. 003 . |
|
July 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (CHURCHWELL, MEIRAV BENZOIN) BY SUB-SERVING JASON CHURCHWELL . COSTS OF $ 30.00 . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.