State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California Employment Development Department Benefit Overpayment Collection Section,
against
Evans, Elouise,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Evans, Elouise
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Evans, Elouise
Date
Type
Description
June 18, 2015
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
September 08, 2008
Docket Event
Order on Claim of Exemption
September 08, 2008
Hearing
Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Civil Law and Motion Heard
September 08, 2008
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Civil Law and Motion - Special Sets heard on 09/08/2008 02:00:00 PM .
September 04, 2008
Docket Event
Evans, Elouise added as a Defendant effective 11/09/2005 .
September 04, 2008
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department 43 .
August 19, 2008
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Civil Law and Motion - Special Sets scheduled for 09/08/2008 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
August 14, 2008
Docket Event
State of California, Employment Development Department added as a Plaintiff effective 08/11/2008 .