Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lopez, Lois, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnauffer, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
Time To Trial479 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time194 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 After Settlement | |
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. KEC Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Off calendar for CRC 225 Dismissal Hearing scheduled for 9-25-2006 . Dismissal filed on 7-12-2006 KEC | |
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Off calendar for Mandatory Settlement Conference scheduled for 3/28/07. Settled kl | |
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of CRC 225 Hrng Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 13-JUN-2006 by KMLATT. |
|
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Off calendar for Trial Readiness scheduled for 4/20/07. Settled kl | |
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Off calendar for Jury Trial scheduled for 4/23/07 . Settled kl |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.