Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Samra, Harminder, Samra, Narinder, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Samra, Kulwinder, Samra, Piara Singh, Sodi, Gurdev, Singh, Daljit, Sodi, Bhupinder Singh, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Franson, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 1993 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. ng | |
September 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$14.00 was made on receipt CVCE75112. |
|
September 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. ng | |
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ or Abstract Received Writ or Abstract of Judgment received for issuance. (2) ng |
|
June 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Name Change
Judge: Franson, Donald R |
|
April 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Notice of Renewal of Judgment, etc. filed. Served on Sukhvir Singh Sodi by Mail on 04-20-05. grs |
|
April 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Renewal of Judgment, etc. filed. Served on Sukhvir Singh Sodi by Mail on 04-20-05. grs |
|
April 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$37.00 was made on receipt CVCE68782. |
|
April 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Memo of costs after judgment Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ Interest: $468,900.73 ng Costs: $ |
|
April 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Memo of costs after judgment Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ Interest: $225,591.35 ng Costs: $ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.