Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ayers, Dylan, Ayers, Ian, Ayers, Mark, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Richard R Johnson, against Carmel Partners Inc, Cp Park Townhomes Llc, Heller, Kenneth D., Stone, Catherine A., Stone, Howard L., (total of 6) See All represented by John C Hentschel, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2006 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Notice to File Dismissal and/or Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal after Settlement
Date: 2008-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-09-15T00:00:00Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor-Ian
Date: December 09, 2008Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-04-25T00:00:00Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor-Dylan
Date: December 09, 2008Amended Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor
Date: December 11, 2008Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: 2008-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2007-12-18T00:00:00Conditional Dismissal
Date: 2008-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2008-07-15T00:00:00Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2008-07-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Unavailabilty) filed.
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2008-10-03T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2008-09-08T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account-Dylan
Date: December 09, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.