Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Robertson, Vernon, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Cyrus Zal A Prof Corp, against Ramirez, Paul Steve, Ramirez Vocational Services, Inc., Olivo, Eugene P., Central Valley Injured Worker Legal Clinic, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/20/2007 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 11/19/2007 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
October 18, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference Heard |
|
October 09, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP Heard |
|
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Ramirez Vocational Services, Inc. added as a Cross - Defendant effective 07/25/2007 . | |
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Cyrus Zal, A Prof Corp. added as a Attorney effective 07/25/2007 . | |
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Olivo, Eugene P. added as a Attorney effective 07/25/2007 . | |
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Ramirez, Paul Steve added as a Cross - Defendant effective 07/25/2007 . | |
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Central Valley Injured Worker Legal Clinic, Inc. added as a Attorney effective 07/25/2007 . | |
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event | ZAL, CYRUS added as a Attorney effective 07/25/2007 . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.