We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Johnston, Gary Patrick ,
filed a(n)
General Torts -
Torts
case
represented by
Christopher W Wood ,
against
Bay Pacific Pipelines, Inc. ,
Trench Plate Rental Company ,
represented by
Gordon & Reese Llp ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
February 21, 1940
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Matter Type
General Torts
Defendants
Bay Pacific Pipelines, Inc.
Trench Plate Rental Company
Other Parties
Anthony G Arlen (Attorney)
Gordon & Reese Llp (Attorney)
State Compensation Insurance Fund (Lien Claimant)
Trench Plate Rental Company (Cross - Complainant)
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker Llp (Attorney)
Case Events for
Johnston, Gary Patrick v. Bay Pacific Pipelines, Inc.
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
January 11, 2008
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 01/10/2008 08:30:00 AM .
Get Document
January 11, 2008
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal .
January 11, 2008
Docket Event
The Court orders Legacy Case Participant Sheet (Conversion Only) State Compensation Insurance Fund be dismissed without prejudice.
January 11, 2008
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal .
January 11, 2008
Docket Event
Legacy Case Participant Sheet (Conversion Only) disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal .
January 10, 2008
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program Heard
January 07, 2008
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .
Get Document
December 31, 2007
Docket Event
Case Notes generated .
December 31, 2007
Docket Event
Legacy Case Participant Sheet (Conversion Only) disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
November 29, 2007
Docket Event
Dismissal entered as requested.
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.