We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Agd Financial Trust 2002 A ,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Harvey M Moore ,
against
Hernandez, Mary J. ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Judge
Judy Holzer Hersher
Filing Date
December 09, 2005
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Plaintiffs
Agd Financial Trust 2002 A
Case Events for
Agd Financial Trust 2002 A v. Hernandez, Mary J.
Date
Type
Description
March 15, 2010
Docket Event
Legacy Case Participant Sheet (Conversion Only) disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
March 15, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
March 15, 2010
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
March 01, 2010
Docket Event
Moore, Harvey M added as a effective 12/09/2005 .
March 01, 2010
Docket Event
Hernandez, Mary J added as a Defendant effective 12/09/2005 .
March 01, 2010
Docket Event
AGD Financial Trust 2002 A added as a Plaintiff effective 12/09/2005 .
February 26, 2010
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Get Document
April 05, 2007
Hearing
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard
February 01, 2007
Hearing
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard
December 09, 2005
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department 45 .
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.