Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Great Seneca Financial Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wolpoff & Abramson Llp, against Stevens, Tom, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/29/2007 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 45 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 45 . | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Panossian, Natalie added as a Attorney effective 08/15/2007 . | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Stevens, Tom added as a Defendant effective 08/15/2007 . | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Wolpoff & Abramson, LLP added as a Attorney effective 08/15/2007 . | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Great Seneca Financial Corporation added as a Plaintiff effective 08/15/2007 . | |
February 15, 2007 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard |
|
December 28, 2006 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.