Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Revenue Management Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ralph L Pollard, against Boardwalk Restaurant Group Inc, represented by Eric O Jeppson, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael P. Kenny presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
JUDGMENT
Date: December 08, 2008Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: April 02, 2009Returned Document - Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2008-09-15T00:00:00Certification for Short Cause Matters filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2008-10-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2008-09-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 11/14/2008 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2008-11-14T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: January 23, 2009Release and Receipt for Exhibits
Date: January 30, 2009Release and Receipt for Exhibits
Date: January 15, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.