Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
At&T Wireless, Cavalry Portfolio Services Assignee, Cavalry Spv I Assignee, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brian N Winn, against Deguzman, Belle A., represented by Roger M Miller, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: March 08, 2016Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2008-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: March 08, 2016Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2008-02-04T00:00:00Writ of Execution filed.
Date: 2008-02-04T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: January 13, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied (Sacramento) filed.
Date: January 07, 2011Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: April 18, 2016Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: January 26, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.