Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gill, Sandeep K, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Singh, Rajvinder, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions266 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time241 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment filmed returned-FL Family Law Judgment Date:08/28/06 Microfilm date:09/19/06 Microfilm Roll Number:345 |
|
September 18, 2006 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Archives for micro film ms 9/18/06 | |
August 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Judgment forwarded to clerks for processing with file Copies to Box 26 8-29-06 cb |
|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg Fld Judgment disso marr/date marital status ends: 8/28/06 ms 9/15/06 |
|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. ms 9/15/06 | |
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Dissolution _X__ ms 9/15/06 Legal Separation ___ Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso |
|
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Flex for Jgmt review/default entered. ms 5/22/06 | |
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Sent default to default desk. tm 042606 |
|
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice and acknowledge rcpt Notice and acknowledgement of receipt of summons and FL petition, blk response filed, signed on 1/15/06. ms 5/17/06 |
|
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of service-summons filed Proof of service of summons on FL petition, blk response filed showing service on Rajvinder Singh by Mail and Acknowledgment of receipt service on 1/11/06. ms 5/17/06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.