Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Holmes, Scott A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Holmes, Linda W, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION, JUDGE Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions162 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time146 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment filmed returned-FL Family Law Judgment Date:05/24/06 Microfilm date:06/07/06 Microfilm Roll Number:337 |
|
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Jgmt fowarded to Archives for micro film ms 6/7/06 |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Forwarded to clerks for processing of judgment without the file djm 053106 |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Filed proof service by mail POS of Judgment of Dissolution. Served on Respondent by mail from Clovis, CA on 05-26-06. 6-26-06 jmc |
|
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. ms 6/7/06 | |
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Dissolution _X__ ms 6/7/06 Legal Separation ___ Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso |
|
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Resp's Preliminary & Final ms 6/7/06 |
|
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg Fld Judgment disso marr/date marital status ends: 6/3/06 ms 6/7/06 |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Sent Judgment to FLEX. rkb 4/13/06 |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Linda W Holmes ms 3/22/06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.