Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez, Michael, Melgoza, Nelly, Melgosa, Jesse, filed a(n) Construction - Torts case against The Allen Group,M Busniess Entity Unknown, Craftsman Collection, Business Entity Unknown, The Allen Group, A California Company, Craftsman Collection At Claremont Grove, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Franson, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFranson, Donald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
Category10 Unlimited - Construction Defect |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions321 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Assignment of Judge Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 10-AUG-2011 by AFRANCO. |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of dismissal filed. ng | |
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of request for dismissal filed. ng |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissal - Other Request for dismissal of COMPLAINT filed and dismissal entered with prejudice. ng |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document sent to archives proof of service and request for dismissal of complaint ng |
|
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of party Request for dismissal of party(s) cross complainants Craftsman Collection at Claremont Grove, The Allen Group and Craftsman Collection filed and dismissal entered with prejudice. ng |
|
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of party Request for dismissal of party(s) International Paintiing and Decorating Inc, B-F Glass Inc, Spence Fence Company, Central Air conditioning Inc, Atmors Corporation, Tri-Valley Plasterint, Overhead door Company of Fresno Inc, Roberson's Plumbing, Lardow Inc, Madera Roofing Inc and Hodges Electric filed and dismissal entered with prejudice. ng |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of dismissal filed. le | |
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissal of party Request for dismissal of party(s) Advance Insulation filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. sg |
|
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice filed Notice of order filed. ng |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.