Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Moreland, Terry L., Moreland Family Llc, Maranatha Corrections Llc, California Department Of Corrections, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Derek F Foran, James P Bennett, Jeffrey R Vincent, against Woodford, Jeanne S., State Of California, Moreland Corporation, represented by Jeffrey R Vincent, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: November 02, 2009Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: October 29, 2009Remittitur
Date: 2008-03-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2008-03-13T00:00:00Order - Motion for Appellate Atty's Fees
Date: May 05, 2008Declaration - Other (Jeff R Vincent in support of motion for attorney's fees) filed.
Date: 2008-03-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion for Attorney Fee's - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/11/2008 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2008-04-11T00:00:00Reply - Other (in support of motion for appellate attorneys fees) filed.
Date: 2008-04-04T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees filed.
Date: 2008-03-13T00:00:00Clerk's Return Document Letter
Date: October 15, 2008Correspondence filed.
Date: October 02, 2008Opposition to Noticed Motion (for appellate attorney's fees under CCP 425.16) filed.
Date: 2008-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2008-03-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.